MD SB910 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases Compact; establishing the Solemn Covenant of States Commission to administer the Compact; providing for the composition, voting procedures, operation, and powers and duties of the Commission; establishing certain procedures for the making of rules by the Commission; authorizing the Commission to establish a management committee; providing for the composition, operation, and powers and duties of the management committee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Solemn Covenant of the States to Award Prizes for Curing Diseases - Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-02-06SenateHearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2020-02-05SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB1051 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General181201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback