MD SB874 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2019, are not eligible for parole consideration until having served 25 years without application of diminution of confinement credits; requiring that a certain decision by the Maryland Parole Commission regarding parole of a certain inmate be transmitted to the Governor; etc.
Title
Crimes - Life Imprisonment - Parole Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |