MD SB795 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "practice audiology" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the licensure and regulation of audiologists to include certain procedures that do not require anesthesia and certain screenings, testing, and imaging.
Title
Health Occupations - Practice Audiology - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1049 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-13) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {163426/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB464 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 1048
Subjects
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Registration
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |