MD SB767 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to a forensic laboratory for analysis unless a certain requirement is met; requiring that a victim who wishes to remain anonymous and not file a criminal complaint be informed that the victim may initiate a criminal complaint at a future time; requiring a certain law enforcement agency that receives a sexual assault evidence collection kit to submit the kit and all requested associated reference standards for forensic analysis within 30 days of receipt of the kit; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits - Analysis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {632010/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {638172/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorney General
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Electronic Government
Evidence
Examinations
Investigations and Inquiries
Laboratories
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Pleas
Privacy
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Electronic Government
Evidence
Examinations
Investigations and Inquiries
Laboratories
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Pleas
Privacy
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Victims