MD SB760 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public school to notify a student's parent or legal guardian about the status of certain school meal accounts under certain circumstances; prohibiting a public school from communicating about unpaid meal debt directly with a student; prohibiting a public school from taking certain actions in response to an unpaid meal debt; requiring a public school to ensure that parents and legal guardians are notified about the application process and eligibility requirements for meal programs; etc.
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable as Amended Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1173 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Debt Collection
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Food
Job Training
Labeling
Language
Literacy
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students
Counties
Debt Collection
Discipline
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Food
Job Training
Labeling
Language
Literacy
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Students