MD SB655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain high performance building requirements to apply to capital projects for which more than 50% of the funding is for the acquisition, construction, or renovation of the project is from State funds; repealing a requirement that the Maryland Green Building Council develop guidelines for new public school buildings to achieve a LEED Silver or comparable rating; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to ensure that certain State buildings, schools and community colleges meet certain standards; etc.
Title
Capital Projects – High Performance and Green Buildings – Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {934239/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1636 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Construction
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Colleges
Construction
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3 | 602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |