MD SB636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Queen Anne's County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Queen Anne's County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Queen Anne's County
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Pensions and Retirement
Queen Anne's County
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Pensions and Retirement