MD SB634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an electric cooperative to construct, maintain, or operate or allow others to construct, maintain, or operate conducting or communications facilities for telecommunications and broadband Internet services along, on, under, or across various types of property; requiring an electric cooperative to give certain notice to certain property owners at least 60 days before constructing certain facilities in a certain electric easement or making capacity available for certain services in the electric easement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Cooperatives - Powers - Conducting or Communications Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {433892/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {167677/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateLaid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {167677/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0634&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0634f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0634t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0634e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_277_sb0634e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0634_16767701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/sb0634_43389201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/sb0634.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0634_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0587.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0634_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1185.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1177.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback