MD SB360 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2025)
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 983928/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 33 N: 96 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 793624/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 323321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 633222/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Committee Amendment (#36) Adopted (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Floor Amendment 733425/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Floor Amendment 743026/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 6 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 983928/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (Y: 33 N: 96 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 793624/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 96 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 323321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Floor Amendment 633222/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-03-20 - House - Committee Amendment (#36) Adopted (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Floor Amendment 733425/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Floor Amendment 743026/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 6 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-9) |
2024-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | House advisors: (Delegates Shetty, Watson and Metzgar) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Chang, J. Lewis, Smith and Ghrist) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2024-03-26 | House | House advisors: (Delegates Shetty, Watson and Metzgar) |
2024-03-26 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Chang, J. Lewis, Smith and Ghrist) |
2024-03-26 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2024-03-26 | House | Senate advisors: (Senators Bailey, Jackson and Zucker) |
2024-03-26 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Rosapepe, McCray, King and Corderman) |
2024-03-26 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-03-26 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate advisors: (Senators Bailey, Jackson and Zucker) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Rosapepe, McCray, King and Corderman) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2024-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-8) |
2024-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {983928/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (33-96) |
2024-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {793624/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (35-96) |
2024-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {323321/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (37-96) |
2024-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment {633222/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (34-100) |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#37-38) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#36) Adopted (103-31) |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#34-35) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#34-38) |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#30-33) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#20-29) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#11-19) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#7-10) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-6) Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Barnes) Adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593121/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {733425/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (12-34) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {743026/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (6-39) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#125-147) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#116-124) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#108-115) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#92-107) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#74-91) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#47-73) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#38-46) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#25-37) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#19-24) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#9-18) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1-8) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB350 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-17 - First Reading Appropriations