MD SB133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law applicable to the registration and authorized use of farm area motor vehicles, including a provision increasing from 10 miles to 25 miles the radius from a farm within which a person may operate on a highway a motor vehicle registered as a farm area motor vehicle; and requiring the owner of a farm area motor vehicle to submit a certain application and documentation for registration of the vehicle.
Title
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized Use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Agriculture
Emergency Bills
Highways
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Emergency Bills
Highways
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration