MD HB795 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for enhanced workers' compensation benefits for a Baltimore City deputy sheriff for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a certain number of weeks; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Special Order until next session (Senator McCray) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783597/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Claims
Disabilities
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Treatments
Notices
Occupational Safety
Sheriffs
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Claims
Disabilities
Health
Health Insurance
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Treatments
Notices
Occupational Safety
Sheriffs
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation