MD HB662 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a requirement that the Department of General Services cooperate with the Maryland Energy Administration when projecting certain costs and performing a certain analysis during a certain phase of the renovation or construction of certain State buildings; repealing a requirement that the Department cooperate with the Administration in setting standards for certain energy performance indices; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of General Services - Energy Consumption Goals and Energy Performance Contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 289
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-14SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12SenateReferred Rules
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-10HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-30HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement12301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement12302(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement4803(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement4806(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback