MD HB581 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of certain Class B fire fighting foam that contains intentionally added PFAS chemicals for certain testing or training purposes; requiring the use of certain foam for fire fighting training; providing that the Act does not restrict the manufacture, sale, or distribution of certain fire fighting foam or the use of certain fire fighting foam in certain operations; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a certain study; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Fire Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-05HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB420 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety91002(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback