MD HB54 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a grant of land transferring residential real property from the estate of a decedent to an heir or a legatee of the decedent from certain requirements for the payment of taxes on real property if the heir or legatee of the decedent enters into a payment plan to pay all the taxes due and owed on the property; exempting a grant of land that is subject to a payment plan for property taxes from certain requirements for the payment of taxes if the grantee agrees to assume the grantor's obligations under the payment plan; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Transfer to Heir or Legatee - Payment Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771 |
2024-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-02 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733023/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733523/1 Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-09-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Beneficiaries
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Counties
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Ombudsmen
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Beneficiaries
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Counties
Debt Collection
Debt Management
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Ombudsmen
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 2 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |