MD HB535 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Complete Streets Program to provide matching grants to certified jurisdictions to promote healthy communities; providing for program funds to be provided by the Governor in the State budget; specifying the requirements for a local government to be designated as a certified jurisdiction; authorizing a certified jurisdiction to apply for matching grants from the Program; specifying the use of matching grant funds; specifying certain requirements for a certified jurisdiction that receives a grant under the Program; etc.
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-28) (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-23) (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-23) (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 721 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-28) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {647371/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-23) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {280514/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Electronic Communication
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Pedestrians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Electronic Communication
Grants
Hearings
Highways
Jurisdiction
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Pedestrians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sidewalks
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of