MD HB527 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "practice social work" to include counseling for alcohol and drug use and addictive behaviors and to clarify that it includes, for certain individuals, the treatment of biopsychosocial conditions under the supervision of a licensed social worker-clinical; requiring the State Board of Social Work Examiners, under certain circumstances, to approve licensees approved to engage in independent practice to provide supervision; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {986980/1 Adopted
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB245 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 543

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations19101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19302(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations19303(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback