MD HB338 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; requiring the State to provide matching funds to counties for a supplement for each child in a household that receives federally funded benefits under the food supplement program; providing for each eligible child a combined State and county supplement of $30 per month in June, July, and August, and $10 in December; requiring a county to submit a certain application by December 1 to receive certain funding; specifying the required State and local shares of funding; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Food Supplements (Summer SNAP for Children Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-21) (Y: 119 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (118-21)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {244964/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback