MD HB248 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Governor's required appropriation of certain funds in the State budget, beginning in fiscal year 2021, to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rate to the 60th percentile of the most recent market rate survey or a certain equivalent.
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Level
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-11) (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 595 |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-11) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Child Care
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Governor
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Budgets
Child Care
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Governor
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid