MD HB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving alleged violations of certain air and water quality requirements in a certain manner; requiring the Department to keep an electronic record of certain complaints for 10 years; requiring the Department Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 793629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 91 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
2021-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2021-04-05HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-03-31SenateThird Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5)
2021-03-31SenateFloor Amendment {123322/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
2021-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-30SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-19SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (96-40)
2021-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {623029/1 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2021-03-17HouseFloor Amendment {793629/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (40-91)
2021-03-16HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {450214/1 Adopted
2021-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-09-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB324 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources1211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0204?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0204f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0204t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0204e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_442_hb0204e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0204_45021401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0204_79362901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0204_62302901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0204_12332201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0204_ent.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0204_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0482.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0580.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0770.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1072.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback