MD HB1687 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Gandhi Brigade Incorporated for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of a digital media lab for the Gandhi Brigade Youth Media program, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Gandhi Brigade Youth Media
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |