MD HB165 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a solar photovoltaic recycling fee; requiring a person installing a solar electric generating facility in the State to pay the fee beginning October 1, 2020; establishing the Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Fund; requiring 20% of the first sale price of each renewable energy credit sold to be deposited into the Fund; providing that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funding for technologies and processes that assist with the recycling of solar photovoltaic systems; etc.
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsors
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Counties
Credit
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Municipal Corporations
Recycling
Renewable Energy Sources
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Solar Energy
Time
Treasurers
Utility Regulation
Budgets
Comptroller
Counties
Credit
Energy
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fees
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments
Municipal Corporations
Recycling
Renewable Energy Sources
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Solar Energy
Time
Treasurers
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |