MD HB1517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program in the Department of Human Services to provide assistance to certain critical medically vulnerable individuals and their households with the application process for certain social services in Baltimore County and the City of Baltimore through certain navigators; requiring the Department to implement and administer the Pilot Program in partnership with certain agencies and organizations; terminating the Act after October 31, 2023; etc.
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Eviction
Food Stamps
Fuel
Grants
Health
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Poverty
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Employees
Sunset
Welfare
Aging, Department of
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Emergencies
Eviction
Food Stamps
Fuel
Grants
Health
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Poverty
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
State Employees
Sunset
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 5A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 5A-08.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |