MD HB1336 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of certain records if the person is convicted of fourth degree burglary; prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search from in any way referring to the existence of certain records relating to certain charges under certain circumstances; establishing the Partial Expungement Workgroup to study, develop a plan, and make legislative recommendations for enabling the expungement of criminal charges that are not currently eligible for expungement; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement, Maryland Judiciary Case Search, and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-31) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {188073/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582716/1 |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1336 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB589 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
SB589 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |