MD HB133 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-09 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland; requiring the Commission to study the history of the African American soldiers who fought for the Union Army; requiring the Commission to make certain recommendations regarding the funding, design, construction, and location of an appropriate memorial dedicated to African American Civil War soldiers; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendation to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2024.
Title
Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Bouchat [R] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Jim Hinebaugh [R] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-06-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Subjects
Armed Forces
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Minorities
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Minorities
Monuments and Memorials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Sunset