MD HB1296 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the inclusion of a certain licensed offshore stationary blind or blind site in a regulated shooting area; authorizing a person to hunt captive raised mallard ducks from a licensed offshore stationary blind or blind site that is included in a regulated shooting area, subject to certain conditions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB1014 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - First Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources10410(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10412(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10512(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10616(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10906(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback