MD HB1086 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Basic Economic Security; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Workgroup; establishing the duties of the Workgroup; prohibiting a member of the Workgroup from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of expenses; requiring the Workgroup to report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020; and terminating the Act at the end of June 30, 2021.
Title
Workgroup to Study Basic Economic Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Foreign Trade
Industry and Technology
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Foreign Trade
Industry and Technology
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1086?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1086f.pdf |