MD HB1079 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to work in conjunction with members of the medical community in leading a certain comprehensive education and treatment program; requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in conjunction with local health departments and the Steering Committee, to develop a public awareness campaign on the importance of an individual knowing one's sickle cell trait status, receiving screening for the sickle cell trait and counseling under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sickle Cell Trait Screening, Treatment, Education, and Public Awareness (Journey's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {506281/1 Adopted
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General18506(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback