LA SCR23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To urge and request the Louisiana Department of Health to study behavioral health demand and access.
Title
To urge and request the Louisiana Department of Health to study behavioral health demand and access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 23 ADOPT (#338) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |