LA SB94 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an exception for certain applicants for employee permits seeking to work in locations permitted by ATC as a restaurant. (8/1/19)
Title
Provides an exception for certain applicants for employee permits seeking to work in locations permitted by ATC as a restaurant. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 94 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |