LA SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the participation of a sexual harasser in a settlement or judgment in a sexual harassment claim. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the participation of a sexual harasser in a settlement or judgment in a sexual harassment claim. (See Act) (EN SEE FISC NOTE OF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 182 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1028) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 ADOPT (#1006) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 REJECT (#931) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 ADOPT (#1006) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 REJECT (#931) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/19. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Foil, Gregory Miller, and Mack. |
2019-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Hewitt, and Luneau. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |