LA SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court of the town of Livingston. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court of the town of Livingston. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#675) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#207) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 349.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-29SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB102&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119670
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127623
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129880
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139287
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144291
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127853
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129318
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130153
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145034
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139259

Bill Comments

feedback