LA HR249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the state Department of Education to study reporting by school systems of incidents of school employees committing child abuse and sexual assault against students
Title
Directs the state Department of Education to study reporting by school systems of incidents of school employees committing child abuse and sexual assault against students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House Vote on HR 249 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1609) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-30 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2024. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-29 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Education. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |