LA HCR10 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to compel the United States Food and Drug Administration to fulfill its duties regarding inspection and testing of imported seafood
Title
Memorializes Congress to compel the United States Food and Drug Administration to fulfill its duties regarding inspection and testing of imported seafood
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#200) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |