LA HB818 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 05/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Healthy Moms, Healthy Babies Advisory Council (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Healthy Moms, Healthy Babies Advisory Council (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 818 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1209) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#951) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#575) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#575) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: 05/23/2018.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 497.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (7-0).
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-11HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB818&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082053
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085409
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087386
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098317
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102017
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087206
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087361
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092578
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093387
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098257
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082055
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085065
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085720
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087299
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087582
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088782
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092695
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107905
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095038
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103772

Bill Comments

feedback