LA HB618 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to accident reporting and access to medical records and information related to claims
Title
Provides relative to accident reporting and access to medical records and information related to claims
Sponsors
Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R] | Rep. Dodie Horton [R] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Jack McFarland [R] |
Rep. Michael Melerine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (10-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |