LA HB610 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the inclusion of the value of certain federal tax credits and special financing provisions when determining the fair market value of certain property for purposes of tax assessment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the inclusion of the value of certain federal tax credits and special financing provisions when determining the fair market value of certain property for purposes of tax assessment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-12 - Senate Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-12HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-12HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-05-12SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-10SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-09SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2016-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2016-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-26HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
2016-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-18HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-04HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-03-04HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB610&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982551
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995322
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=992754
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995138
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982624
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=994978
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995447
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996056
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997765
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002978

Bill Comments

feedback