LA HB587 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Levies a state tax on the net proceeds of sports wagering, dedicates the avails of the tax, and imposes certain gaming fees (RE +$1,225,000 SD EX See Note)
Title
Levies a state tax on the net proceeds of sports wagering, dedicates the avails of the tax, and imposes certain gaming fees (RE +$1,225,000 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#616) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 587 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 46. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2019-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19. |
2019-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2019-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (12-9). |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2019-04-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |