LA HB565 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to renovation of public historic buildings (RE NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to renovation of public historic buildings (RE NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] | Rep. Wilford Carter [D] | Rep. Tehmi Chassion [D] | Rep. Steven Jackson [D] |
Rep. Candace Newell [D] | Rep. Sylvia Taylor [D] | Rep. Joy Walters [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 565 FINAL PASSAGE (#1256) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 565 FINAL PASSAGE (#1256) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 565 FINAL PASSAGE (#1256) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2024. |
2024-05-21 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |