LA HB479 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the New Orleans Ferry Fund and provides for the use of the monies in the fund (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Establishes the New Orleans Ferry Fund and provides for the use of the monies in the fund (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 479 FINAL PASSAGE (#500) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 479 FINAL PASSAGE (#302) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 479 FINAL PASSAGE (#302) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2019. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 163. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | House committee amendments rejected. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |