LA HB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Hearing: Apr 25 @ 9:30 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Changes actuarial funding method for the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR DECREASE FC LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes actuarial funding method for the Firefighters' Retirement System (OR DECREASE FC LF EX)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
2019-02-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2019-02-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback