KY SB20 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 194A.700 to 194A.729 to prohibit certification or certification renewal of an assisted-living community if it is owned, managed, or operated by any person convicted of certain crimes or listed on an abuse list; exempt owner of an assisted-living facility certified as of July 1, 2020; amend KRS 194A.700 to amend definitions; amend KRS 194A.707 to make changes to the appeals and renewal processes; amend KRS 194A.717 to prohibit on-site staff person from being shared with another level of care; amend KRS 194A.723 to permit the cabinet to initiate injunctive relief in Circuit Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to assisted-living communities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-08-20SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback