KY HB477 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to establish diagnosis criteria for sepsis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the diagnosis of sepsis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3072 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 167 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-09Housesigned by Governor
2024-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-27Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-27Housereceived in House
2024-03-27Senatepassed 35-0
2024-03-27SenateFloor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title) Withdrawn
2024-03-27Senate3rd reading
2024-03-26Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-25Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-21Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2024-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024
2024-03-15Senatefloor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
2024-03-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2024-03-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2024-03-01Senateto Health Services (S)
2024-02-28Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2024-02-27House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2024-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2024
2024-02-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2024-02-20Houseto Health Services (H)
2024-02-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback