KY HB375 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 95A.020 to define "chief fire officer"; change the name of the Commission on Fire Protection Personnel Standards and Education to the Kentucky Fire Commission; attach the commission to the Kentucky Community and Technical College System for administrative purposes; require the commission to have male, female, and minority representation; require that no more than three appointed members reside in the same congressional district; reduce the number of members from 17 to 14; change the qualifications for certain members appointed to the commission by the Governor; amend various sections to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1385 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 166 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-18Senate3rd reading, passed 31-0
2020-03-18Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
2020-03-17Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-05Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2020-03-03Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-02House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2020-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020
2020-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-02-06Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-02-04Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback