KY HB316 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.011 to require each Council on Postsecondary Education board meeting to include a public comment period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Council on Postsecondary Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 260 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Senateto Education (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-18House3rd reading, passed 84-1 with floor amendment (2)
2020-03-17Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2020-03-17Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
2020-03-09Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-01-27Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-23Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback