KY HB286 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 314.011 to allow designated advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric-mental health nursing to prescribe up to two sequential refills for a 30 day supply of psychostimulants; amend KRS 314.042 to remove the one-year practice requirement before an APRN may prescribe controlled substances under a CAPA-CS; establish conditions for an APRN to prescribe controlled substances without a CAPA-CS after four years of controlled substance prescribing authority under a CAPA-CS; require an APRN to confirm with the nursing board that the APRN's license is in good standing before prescribing without a CAPA-CS; set procedures for the nursing board's license review; prohibit any attempt to require or compel an APRN to maintain a CAPA-CS to prescribe after the four-year threshold; exempt an equivalently qualified out-of-state APRN from the CAPA-CS requirement to prescribe under licensure by endorsement; require an APRN with less than four years of prescribing controlled substances to maintain a CAPA-CS until the four years are completed.
Title
AN ACT relating to the prescriptive authority of advanced practice registered nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-22 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-01-17 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Boards and Commissions
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb286.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb286/orig_bill.pdf |