KS SB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting certain domestic insurers from filing enterprise risk reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting certain domestic insurers from filing enterprise risk reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Billinger and Senator Ware as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2019-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-21HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-20SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-31SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback