KS SB219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Hearing: Thursday, May 2, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 582-N
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 219 by Committee on Judiciary - Transferring responsibility for the scrap metal database to the Kansas bureau of investigation, reducing the registration fee for scrap metal dealers and changing scrap metal dealer obligations under the scrap metal theft reduction act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 219 by Committee on Judiciary - Transferring responsibility for the scrap metal database to the Kansas bureau of investigation, reducing the registration fee for scrap metal dealers and changing scrap metal dealer obligations under the scrap metal theft reduction act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, May 2, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 582-N
2019-05-02HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, May 2, 2019, 8:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was rejected
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
2019-03-18SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback