KS SB211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the attorney general to appoint a Kansas youth suicide prevention coordinator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the attorney general to appoint a Kansas youth suicide prevention coordinator.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2019-03-12SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-25SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback