KS HB2773 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Kansas safe and secure schools act.
Title
Creating the Kansas safe and secure schools act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 119 Nay: 5 (Y: 119 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 2 Failed. - Yea: 44 Nay: 79 (Y: 44 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 1 Failed. - Yea: 50 Nay: 72 (Y: 50 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected - Yea: 35 Nay: 88 (Y: 35 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Clayton was rejected - Yea: 49 Nay: 75 (Y: 49 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 2 Failed. - Yea: 44 Nay: 79 (Y: 44 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 1 Failed. - Yea: 50 Nay: 72 (Y: 50 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected - Yea: 35 Nay: 88 (Y: 35 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Clayton was rejected - Yea: 49 Nay: 75 (Y: 49 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-28 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 5 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 2 Failed. Yea: 44 Nay: 79 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Parker Amendment Part 1 Failed. Yea: 50 Nay: 72 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Representative Whitmer requested the motion to amend by Representative Parker be divided. The amendment was ruled divisible and divided into 2 parts. |
2018-03-27 | House | House Representative Whitmer raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Parker |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected Yea: 35 Nay: 88 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Representative Williams raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Clayton was rejected Yea: 49 Nay: 75 |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Clayton |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Friday, March 16, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2018-03-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | House Introduced |