IL SB0734 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act. Provides that beginning on the effective date of the Act, any food offered for retail sale in this State is misbranded if it is entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering and that fact is not disclosed in a certain manner. Provides that the Act shall not be construed to require either the listing or identification of any ingredient or ingredients that were genetically engineered, nor that the term "genetically engineered" be placed immediately preceding any common name or primary product descriptor of a food. Provides that until the effective date of the Act, any processed food that would be subject to the provision concerning the labeling of genetically engineered foods solely because it includes one or more materials produced by genetic engineering is not misbranded provided that the engineered materials in the aggregate do not account for more than a certain amount of the total weight of the processed food. Sets forth provisions concerning applicability and the right of action for violations, damages, and attorneys' fees. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules necessary to implement the Act. Defines terms. Contains a severability provision. Effective January 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GENETICALLY ENGINEERED FOOD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2015-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-05-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2015-03-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
2015-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2015-03-26SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2015-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2015-03-19SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2015-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-03-12SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2015-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2015-03-05SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2015-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2015-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2015-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2015-03-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-03-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2015-02-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2015-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2015-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2015-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2015-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2015-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2015-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-02-03SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback